MI SB0087 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned Pa 1 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned Pa 1 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: district court; ninety-fifth-a district court; restore. Amends sec. 8160 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8160).
Title
Courts: district court; ninety-fifth-a district court; restore. Amends sec. 8160 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8160).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Assigned Pa 1 With Immediate Effect |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/21/2019 12:56 Pm |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Approved By Governor 03/21/2019 09:35 Am |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Presented To Governor 03/14/2019 10:55 Am |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2019-03-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Received On 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Edward Mcbroom |