MI SB0112 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Assigned Pa 0041'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property; other; defenses to action for unlawful ejectment; revise persons who may determine abandonment of premises. Amends sec. 2918 of 1961 PA 236 ( MCL 600.2918).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; other; defenses to action for unlawful ejectment; revise persons who may determine abandonment of premises. Amends sec. 2918 of 1961 PA 236 ( MCL 600.2918).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 15 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateAssigned Pa 0041'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-10SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/1/2019 @ 11:50 Am
2019-07-10SenateBecame Law Without Governor's Signature
2019-06-18SenatePresented To Governor 6/17/2019 @ 10:17 Am
2019-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-12SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-06-11HouseReturned To Senate
2019-06-11HouseInserted Full Title
2019-06-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2019-06-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-06HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-21HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-21HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-04-09HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-04-09HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-09HouseReceived On 04/09/2019
2019-04-09SenatePassed Roll Call # 15 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-03-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2019-03-14SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2019-03-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2019-03-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-03-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-3
2019-02-13SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0112
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0112.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0112.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0112.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0112.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-03-12-025.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-09-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-21-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-11-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback