MI SB0128 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Assigned Pa 0042'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations; health professionals; definition of bona fide prescriber-patient relationship; revise. Amends sec. 7104 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7104). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4225'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations; health professionals; definition of bona fide prescriber-patient relationship; revise. Amends sec. 7104 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7104). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4225'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 160 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 21 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateAssigned Pa 0042'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-10SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/8/2019 @ 2:14 Pm
2019-07-10SenateApproved By Governor 7/8/2019 @ 8:40 Am
2019-06-25SenatePresented To Governor 6/25/2019 @ 9:26 Am
2019-06-20SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-20SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-20SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-06-20Senate Roll Call # 160 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-20SenateHouse Substitute H-2 Concurred In
2019-06-20SenateRules Suspended For Immediate Consideration
2019-06-19HouseReturned To Senate
2019-06-19HouseInserted Full Title
2019-06-19HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2019-06-19HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-19HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2019-06-19HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-19HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-06-06HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-2
2019-04-18HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-04-18HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-18HouseReceived On 04/18/2019
2019-04-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 21 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-04-10SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-04-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-03-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-03-19SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis Hertel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0128
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0128.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0128.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0128.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0128.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0042.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-03-19-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-18-036.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-19-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-20-064.htm

Bill Comments

feedback