MI SB0152 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0154'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 342 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 340 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 174 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0154'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 10:52 Am
2019-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/20/2019 10:00 Am
2019-12-19SenatePresented To Governor 12/16/2019 02:08 Pm
2019-12-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-12-10HouseRe-returned To Senate
2019-12-10HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 342 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-12-10HouseSenate Amendment(s) To House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
2019-12-10HouseRule Suspended
2019-12-10HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-12-10HouseRe-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute (h-2) With Immediate Effect
2019-12-10SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-12-10SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 340 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-12-10SenateHouse Substitute (h-2) Concurred In As Amended
2019-12-10SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2019-12-05SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-12-04HouseReturned To Senate
2019-12-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2019-12-04HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-04HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-04HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2019-12-04HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-04HousePlaced On Second Reading
2019-12-04HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2019-12-04HouseRule Suspended
2019-08-29HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-08-29HouseRead A First Time
2019-08-29HouseReceived On 08/29/2019
2019-08-29SenatePassed Roll Call # 174 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-08-29SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-08-29SenateRules Suspended
2019-08-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-08-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-08-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-08-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-08-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0152
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0154.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-08-29-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-04-111.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-10-114.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-10-113.htm

Bill Comments

feedback