MI SB0155 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Assigned Pa 0017'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tobacco; retail sales; sellers of liquid nicotine containers to ensure that the products meet certain requirements; require, and restrict customer access to certain products. Amends 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 - 722.645) by adding secs. 2b & 2c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0106'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco; retail sales; sellers of liquid nicotine containers to ensure that the products meet certain requirements; require, and restrict customer access to certain products. Amends 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 - 722.645) by adding secs. 2b & 2c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0106'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 24 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateAssigned Pa 0017'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-05SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 6/4/2019 @ 12:04 Pm
2019-06-05SenateApproved By Governor 6/4/2019 @ 10:34 Am
2019-05-22SenatePresented To Governor 5/21/2019 @ 3:08 Pm
2019-05-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-16SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-05-16SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-05-15HouseReturned To Senate
2019-05-15HouseInserted Full Title
2019-05-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 Yeas 99 Nays 10
2019-05-15HouseRead A Third Time
2019-05-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-05-14HouseRead A Second Time
2019-04-30HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-04-30HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-04-23HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-04-23HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-23HouseReceived On 04/23/2019
2019-04-23SenatePassed Roll Call # 24 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-04-16SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-04-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-03-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-03-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Marshall Bullock

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0155
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0155.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0155.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0155.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0155.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0017.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-03-20-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-23-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-30-040.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-15-047.htm

Bill Comments

feedback