MI SB0248 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0136'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0136'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: pharmaceuticals; physician or other licensee who writes prescriptions; require to electronically transmit to pharmacy under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7333, 16226, 16322, 16501, 16511, 16513, 16521, 16525, 16529, 17744, & 17751 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7333 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4217'19, SB 0254'19
Title
Health: pharmaceuticals; physician or other licensee who writes prescriptions; require to electronically transmit to pharmacy under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7333, 16226, 16322, 16501, 16511, 16513, 16521, 16525, 16529, 17744, & 17751 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7333 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4217'19, SB 0254'19
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Johnson [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Sen. Adam Hollier [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] |
Sen. Rosemary Bayer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 245 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 362 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 362 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0136'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2020 12:22 Pm |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/08/2020 10:26 Am |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/30/2020 10:55 Am |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 245 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2020-06-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Title Amended |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-10 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-06-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2019 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 362 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-4) Concurred In |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-4) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-4) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ruth Johnson |
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Health occupations: physicians
Health: occupations
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: physicians
Health: occupations
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs