MI SB0255 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Assigned Pa 0120'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental protection; air pollution; location notification requirement; modify. Amends sec. 5505 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5505).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental protection; air pollution; location notification requirement; modify. Amends sec. 5505 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5505).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 189 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20SenateAssigned Pa 0120'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-11-20SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/15/2019 09:26 Am
2019-11-20SenateApproved By Governor 11/14/2019 01:43 Pm
2019-11-20SenatePresented To Governor 11/04/2019 02:15 Pm
2019-10-30SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-30SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-10-30SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-10-29HouseReturned To Senate
2019-10-29HouseInserted Full Title
2019-10-29HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-10-29HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-23HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-15HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-10-08HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-09-04HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2019-09-04HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-04HouseReceived On 09/04/2019
2019-09-04SenatePassed Roll Call # 189 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-08-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-08-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-06-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-06-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-06-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-04-10SenateReferred To Committee On Environmental Quality
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced By Senator Kim Lasata

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0255
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0255.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0255.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0255.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0255.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0120.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-19-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-09-04-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-15-096.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-29-102.htm

Bill Comments

feedback