MI SB0268 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Assigned Pa 0084'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Assigned Pa 0084'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: financial aid; Michigan reconnect grant act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5580'20, HB 5576'20
Title
Higher education: financial aid; Michigan reconnect grant act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5580'20, HB 5576'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 117 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 180 (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 109 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 180 (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 109 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0084'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 10:18 Am |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Approved By Governor 04/02/2020 09:06 Am |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 03/19/2020 01:08 Pm |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 117 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 180 Yeas 81 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 17 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-03-12 | House | Received On 03/12/2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 109 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-4) Concurred In |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-4) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-4) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |