MI SB0276 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0258'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0258'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; objects suspended from rearview mirror; remove from prohibition. Amends sec. 709 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.709).
Title
Traffic control; violations; objects suspended from rearview mirror; remove from prohibition. Amends sec. 709 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.709).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0258'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 2:08 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/14/2010 @ 12:34 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:15 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 Yeas 95 Nays 5 | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-09-22 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-09-22 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-10-14 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-10-14 | Read A First Time | |
2009-10-14 | Received On 10/14/2009 | |
2009-10-14 | Passed Roll Call # 532 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-10-13 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-10-13 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-10-13 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-10-07 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-10-07 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-07 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-02-19 | Referred To Committee On Transportation |