MI SB0319 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0003'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0003'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; definition of rehabilitated facility; modify. Amends secs. 2, 7, 10 & 11 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.772 et seq.) & adds sec. 2a.
Title
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; definition of rehabilitated facility; modify. Amends secs. 2, 7, 10 & 11 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.772 et seq.) & adds sec. 2a.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 1 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 217 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 217 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0003'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 02:58 Pm |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/24/2020 10:35 Am |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:26 Am |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 1 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-12-11 | House | Title Amended |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 90 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-19 | House | Received On 09/19/2019 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 217 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |