MI SB0341 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; search and seizure; warrant requirement to access or obtain certain electronic data; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Criminal procedure; search and seizure; warrant requirement to access or obtain certain electronic data; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 321 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2019 |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 321 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido |