MI SB0376 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; multidepartment omnibus budget appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates new appropriations act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; multidepartment omnibus budget appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates new appropriations act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 327 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-05HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-12-05HouseRead A First Time
2019-12-05HouseReceived On 12/05/2019
2019-12-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 327 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-12-04SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-04SenateRules Suspended
2019-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-04SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-12-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2019-12-04SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2019-06-13SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback