MI SB0492 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0479'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0479'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Education; attendance; eligibility for kindergarten early entry for school of choice students; revise school code to allow. Amends sec. 1147 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1147).
Title
Education; attendance; eligibility for kindergarten early entry for school of choice students; revise school code to allow. Amends sec. 1147 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1147).
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Caswell [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 743 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 412 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 412 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0479'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 3:30 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 1:16 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 10:06 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 743 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-10-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-16 | House | Received On 10/16/2013 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 412 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bruce Caswell |
Subjects
Education, attendance
Education, school choice
Education, school districts
State agencies (existing), education
Education, school choice
Education, school districts
State agencies (existing), education