MI SB0771 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0438'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0438'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; financing; disposition of bond proceeds from school loan revolving fund bonds by state administrative board; provide for. Amends secs. 1, 2 & 4 of 1961 PA 112 (MCL 388.981 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0770'11, SB 0772'11
Title
Education; financing; disposition of bond proceeds from school loan revolving fund bonds by state administrative board; provide for. Amends secs. 1, 2 & 4 of 1961 PA 112 (MCL 388.981 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0770'11, SB 0772'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 824 (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 463 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 463 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0438'12 |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 9:55 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:24 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/20/2012 @ 4:34 Pm |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 824 Yeas 68 Nays 41 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-07 | House | Received On 06/07/2012 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 463 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |