MI SB0791 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0416'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0416'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; underground storage tanks; funding and cleanup programs; establish. Amends heading of pt. 215 & secs. 21502, 21503, 21504, 21505, 21506a, 21508, 21509, 21510, 21515, 21516, 21518, 21519, 21521, 21523, 21524, 21525, 21526, 21527, 21528, 21531, 21546 & 21548 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21502 et seq.); adds secs. 21506b, 21510a, 21510b & 21510c & repeals secs. 21506, 21511, 21512, 21513, 21514, 21517, 21520, 21522, 21545, 21547, 21549, 21550, 21551, 21553, 21554, 21555, 21556, 21557, 21558, 21559, 21560, 21561 & 21563 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21506 et seq.).
Title
Environmental protection; underground storage tanks; funding and cleanup programs; establish. Amends heading of pt. 215 & secs. 21502, 21503, 21504, 21505, 21506a, 21508, 21509, 21510, 21515, 21516, 21518, 21519, 21521, 21523, 21524, 21525, 21526, 21527, 21528, 21531, 21546 & 21548 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21502 et seq.); adds secs. 21506b, 21510a, 21510b & 21510c & repeals secs. 21506, 21511, 21512, 21513, 21514, 21517, 21520, 21522, 21545, 21547, 21549, 21550, 21551, 21553, 21554, 21555, 21556, 21557, 21558, 21559, 21560, 21561 & 21563 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21506 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 699 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 856 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 310 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 856 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 310 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0416'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:53 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2014 @ 8:08 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:36 Am |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Roll Call # 856 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 2 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 699 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-05-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Received On 05/21/2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 310 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Green |