MI SB0826 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health: code; definition of mental health professional; expand to include physician assistants, certified nurse practitioners, and clinical nurse specialists-certified, and allow them to perform certain examinations. Amends secs. 100a, 100b, 100c, 281b, 400, 420, 423, 425, 426, 427, 429, 430, 434, 435, 438, 452, 461, 463, 498o, 517, 532, 700, 740 & 742 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100a et seq.).
Title
Mental health: code; definition of mental health professional; expand to include physician assistants, certified nurse practitioners, and clinical nurse specialists-certified, and allow them to perform certain examinations. Amends secs. 100a, 100b, 100c, 281b, 400, 420, 423, 425, 426, 427, 429, 430, 434, 435, 438, 452, 461, 463, 498o, 517, 532, 700, 740 & 742 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100a et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 323 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2020 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 323 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 322 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall |
Subjects
Health occupations: mental health care professionals
Health occupations: nurses
Health occupations: physician's assistants
Mental health: code
Health occupations: nurses
Health occupations: physician's assistants
Mental health: code