MI SB0889 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0451'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0451'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; living care disclosure act; repeal sentencing guidelines for. Amends sec. 15b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.15b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0886'14
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; living care disclosure act; repeal sentencing guidelines for. Amends sec. 15b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.15b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0886'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 698 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 565 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 565 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0451'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2015 @ 2:52 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/31/2014 @ 4:28 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:42 Am |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 698 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 565 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Nofs |
Subjects
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, hospices
Health facilities, long-term care facilities
Health facilities, nursing homes
Human services, adult foster care
Senior citizens, housing
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, hospices
Health facilities, long-term care facilities
Health facilities, nursing homes
Human services, adult foster care
Senior citizens, housing