MI SB0889 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0233'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0233'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; requirements for teacher certification; eliminate the basic skills exam. Amends secs. 1233b & 1531 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1233b & 380.1531).
Title
Education; teachers; requirements for teacher certification; eliminate the basic skills exam. Amends secs. 1233b & 1531 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1233b & 380.1531).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 521 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 339 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 339 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0233'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2018 @ 9:22 Am |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/26/2018 @ 11:02 Am |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 1:38 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 521 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Received On 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 339 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |