MI SB0947 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0560'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0560'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; collection practices; records of licensed collection agencies; modify requirement for department audit. Amends secs. 910 & 917 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.910 & 339.917).
Title
Occupations; collection practices; records of licensed collection agencies; modify requirement for department audit. Amends secs. 910 & 917 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.910 & 339.917).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 914 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 756 (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 753 (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 383 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 381 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 756 (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 753 (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 383 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 381 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0560'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 2:50 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:06 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 10:56 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 914 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed Roll Call # 756 Yeas 65 Nays 45 |
2014-12-18 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 753 Yeas 66 Nays 44 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-18 | House | Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Received On 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 383 Yeas 27 Nays 9 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 381 Yeas 28 Nays 7 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
HB4097 (Same As) 2013-01-29 - Printed Bill Filed 01/25/2013
Subjects
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Occupations, collection practices
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, collection practices
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs