MI SB0980 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0485'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0485'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; trusts; powers of appointment; revise. Amends secs. 2, 5, 12, 14 & 20 of 1967 PA 224 (MCL 556.112 et seq.) & adds sec. 5a.
Title
Probate; trusts; powers of appointment; revise. Amends secs. 2, 5, 12, 14 & 20 of 1967 PA 224 (MCL 556.112 et seq.) & adds sec. 5a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 769 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 373 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 373 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0485'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:14 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2012 @ 11:24 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:40 Am |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 769 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-13 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2012-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-23 | House | Received On 05/23/2012 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 373 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |