MI SB1000 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0600'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0600'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; parenting time; parenting time in a country not a party to the Hague convention on the civil aspects of international child abduction; prohibit. Amends sec. 7a of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.27a).
Title
Family law; parenting time; parenting time in a country not a party to the Hague convention on the civil aspects of international child abduction; prohibit. Amends sec. 7a of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.27a).
Sponsors
Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. John Moolenaar [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. Howard Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 806 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 709 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 709 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0600'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:26 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:08 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:24 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 806 Yeas 90 Nays 20 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 10/17/2012 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 709 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |