MI SB1079 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0272'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0272'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; Michigan economic growth authority; next Michigan development businesses; expand eligibility. Amends sec. 3 of 1995 PA 24 (MCL 207.803). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5349'09
Title
Economic development; Michigan economic growth authority; next Michigan development businesses; expand eligibility. Amends sec. 3 of 1995 PA 24 (MCL 207.803). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5349'09
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] | Sen. Raymond Basham [D] | Sen. Bill Hardiman [R] | Sen. Tupac Hunter [D] |
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0272'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/15/2010 @ 4:40 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/15/2010 @ 1:20 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/10/2010 @ 4:35 Pm | |
2010-12-03 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-03 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-03 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-03 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-01 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-01 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-01 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 517 Yeas 77 Nays 23 | |
2010-12-01 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-11-30 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 551 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-10 | Amendment(s) Concurred In | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-11-10 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-10 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
HB5351 (Same As) 2010-01-13 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism