MI SB1091 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0359'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0359'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; professional investigators; persons exempt from professional investigator licensure act; expand to include certified public accountants and public accounting firms. Amends sec. 4 of 1965 PA 285 (MCL 338.824).
Title
Occupations; professional investigators; persons exempt from professional investigator licensure act; expand to include certified public accountants and public accounting firms. Amends sec. 4 of 1965 PA 285 (MCL 338.824).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0359'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:00 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:16 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/17/2010 @ 2:12 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 679 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-03 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 598 Yeas 89 Nays 5 | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-03 | Amended | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-03-09 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | |
2010-03-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-09 | Received On 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Roll Call # 95 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-03-02 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-03-02 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-01-27 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform |
Subjects
Occupations, accounting
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
Occupations, professional investigators
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
Occupations, professional investigators
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth