MI SB1103 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0222'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation: funds; depositing funds from marihuana tax into Michigan transportation fund; allow. Amends sec. 10 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.660).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: funds; depositing funds from marihuana tax into Michigan transportation fund; allow. Amends sec. 10 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.660).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21SenateAssigned Pa 0222'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-21SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 10/16/2020 05:20 Pm
2020-10-21SenateApproved By Governor 10/16/2020 08:06 Am
2020-10-06SenatePresented To Governor 10/05/2020 11:54 Am
2020-09-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-09-29SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-09-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-09-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-09-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-09-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-09-23HouseRead A Second Time
2020-09-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-09-23HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-09-16HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2020-09-16HouseRead A First Time
2020-09-16HouseReceived On 09/16/2020
2020-09-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 315 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-09-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-09-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-09-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-09-10SenateRules Suspended
2020-09-10SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis Hertel, Jr.

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-1103
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-1103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-1103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-1103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-1103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0222.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-16-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-23-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-24-076.htm

Bill Comments

feedback