MI SB1105 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax: payment in lieu of taxes; payment in lieu of taxes for certain renewable energy facilities; provide for. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1106'20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax: payment in lieu of taxes; payment in lieu of taxes for certain renewable energy facilities; provide for. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1106'20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 577 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 561 (Y: 73 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 454 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-30SenateVetoed By Governor 12/30/2020
2020-12-23SenatePresented To Governor 12/21/2020 01:38 Pm
2020-12-17SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-12-17SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2020-12-17SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 577 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-12-17SenateHouse Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
2020-12-16SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-12-16HouseReturned To Senate
2020-12-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 561 Yeas 73 Nays 34 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-12-16HouseRead A Third Time
2020-12-16HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-12-16HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-12-16HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2020-12-16HouseRead A Second Time
2020-12-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-12-15HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-12-08HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-12-08HouseRead A First Time
2020-12-04HouseReceived On 12/04/2020
2020-12-03SenatePassed Roll Call # 454 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-12-03SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-12-03SenateRules Suspended
2020-12-03SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-12-03SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-12-03SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-11-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-11-10SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-11-10SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-10SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2020-09-10SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-1105
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-1105.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-1105.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-1105.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-1105.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-11-10-085.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-12-03-090.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-12-16-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-12-17-096.htm

Bill Comments

feedback