MI SB1133 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0489'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0489'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; sale of Ypsilanti state police post; provide for. Creates land transfer act.
Title
Property; conveyances; sale of Ypsilanti state police post; provide for. Creates land transfer act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 666 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 626 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 626 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0489'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:22 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:36 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 9:52 Am |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-04 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 666 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-09-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-13 | House | Received On 09/13/2012 |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 626 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |