MI SB1140 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0489'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0489'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; eligibility for personal injury protection benefits; clarify that an excluded driver is not eligible and that any occupant who knows that a vehicle is unlawfully taken is not eligible. Amends sec. 3113 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3113).
Title
Insurance; no-fault; eligibility for personal injury protection benefits; clarify that an excluded driver is not eligible and that any occupant who knows that a vehicle is unlawfully taken is not eligible. Amends sec. 3113 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3113).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 799 (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 906 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 749 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 774 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 906 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 749 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 774 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0489'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 3:50 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 1:24 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:22 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Re-returned To Senate |
2014-12-19 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 799 Yeas 100 Nays 10 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-18 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 906 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In As Amended |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 749 Yeas 101 Nays 8 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-18 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-12-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2014 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 774 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Virgil Smith |