MI SB1142 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0481'14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0481'14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Fire; other; standards for fire drills; modify for colleges and universities. Amends sec. 19 of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.19) & adds sec. 19a.
Title
Fire; other; standards for fire drills; modify for colleges and universities. Amends sec. 19 of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.19) & adds sec. 19a.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 744 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 766 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 766 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0481'14 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 3:34 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 1:20 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 10:42 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed Roll Call # 744 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2014 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 766 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Education |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mark Jansen |
Subjects
Fire, other
Higher education, community colleges
Higher education, private schools
Higher education, state universities
Higher education, community colleges
Higher education, private schools
Higher education, state universities