MI SB1156 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0560'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0560'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water; quality; state water pollution control revolving fund; modify definition of disadvantaged community to be eligible for clean water assistance. Amends secs. 5301 & 5303 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5301 & 324.5303) & repeals sec. 5315 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5315). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5673'12, SB 1155'12, SB 1157'12, SB 1158'12
Title
Water; quality; state water pollution control revolving fund; modify definition of disadvantaged community to be eligible for clean water assistance. Amends secs. 5301 & 5303 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5301 & 324.5303) & repeals sec. 5315 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5315). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5673'12, SB 1155'12, SB 1157'12, SB 1158'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 936 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 717 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 734 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 717 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 734 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0560'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:14 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 1:13 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 12:46 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 936 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 717 Yeas 67 Nays 41 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 11/08/2012 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 734 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
Same As/Similar To
HB5674 (Same As) 2012-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes