MI SB1233 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0241'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0241'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652).
Title
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0241'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 1:34 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/14/2010 @ 11:12 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:35 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 537 Yeas 60 Nays 41 | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-29 | Received On 09/29/2010 | |
2010-09-29 | Passed Roll Call # 483 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-28 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-09-28 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-09-23 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-09-23 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-23 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |