MI SB1307 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0613'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0613'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing; verification of school enrollment or employment of individual released from jail to attend school or for employment purposes; amend day parole act to require and provide for conditions of release. Amends sec. 1 of 1962 PA 60 (MCL 801.251) & adds sec. 1a.
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing; verification of school enrollment or employment of individual released from jail to attend school or for employment purposes; amend day parole act to require and provide for conditions of release. Amends sec. 1 of 1962 PA 60 (MCL 801.251) & adds sec. 1a.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1060 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1061 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 696 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1061 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 696 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0613'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:52 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:54 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:44 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1060 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 800 Yeas 96 Nays 14 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 10/17/2012 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 696 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB5960 (Same As) 2012-11-08 - Printed Bill Filed 10/17/2012