MI SB1493 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0369'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0369'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; minimum seating capacity for license issued in a development district; revise. Amends sec. 521a of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1521a).
Title
Liquor; licenses; minimum seating capacity for license issued in a development district; revise. Amends sec. 521a of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1521a).
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0369'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:20 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:36 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/20/2010 @ 11:48 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-15 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 608 Yeas 89 Nays 7 | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 539 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-11-10 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-10 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-09-14 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform |