MI SB1528 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0377'10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0377'10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; charitable organizations; charitable solicitation; require registration and make general revisions to charitable organizations and solicitations act. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 5, 7, 11, 13, 16, 18, 20, 21 & 23 of 1975 PA 169 (MCL 400.272 et seq.); adds secs. 17a, 23a & 23b & repeals secs. 12 & 14 of 1975 PA 169 (MCL 400.282 & 400.284).
Title
Businesses; charitable organizations; charitable solicitation; require registration and make general revisions to charitable organizations and solicitations act. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 5, 7, 11, 13, 16, 18, 20, 21 & 23 of 1975 PA 169 (MCL 400.272 et seq.); adds secs. 17a, 23a & 23b & repeals secs. 12 & 14 of 1975 PA 169 (MCL 400.282 & 400.284).
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Basham [D] | Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Tupac Hunter [D] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Sen. Wayne Kuipers [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] | Sen. Gerald Van Woerkom [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0377'10 | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:36 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:52 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/20/2010 @ 11:50 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Roll Call # 688 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-15 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-15 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Passed Roll Call # 607 Yeas 91 Nays 2 | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 529 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-10 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-11-10 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-10 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
HB6538 (Same As) 2010-10-20 - Reassign To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life 10/15/2010
Subjects
Businesses, charitable organizations
Businesses, nonprofit corporations
Businesses, other
Consumer protection, other
Occupations, registration
Businesses, nonprofit corporations
Businesses, other
Consumer protection, other
Occupations, registration