MN HF1007 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Author added Pinto
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Author added Pinto
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lead safe homes grant program created, and money appropriated.
Title
Lead safe homes grant program created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Pinto |
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Vang |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1798 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Chief author added Hall