MN HF1022 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utility's solar energy incentive program amended.
Title
Utility's solar energy incentive program amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1423 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy