MN HF103 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Digital picture and recording misrepresentation crime provided.
Title
Digital picture and recording misrepresentation crime provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2005 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy