MN HF1043 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Lippert and Jurgens
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Lippert and Jurgens
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing support rates modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing support rates modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Lippert and Jurgens |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Lee and Hornstein |
2019-03-14 | House | Authors added Lillie and Huot |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1864 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy