MN HF1049 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile food shelf grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Mobile food shelf grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Acomb, Hassan, and Kunesh-Podein |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF356 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy