MN HF1056 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education partnership program modified, future grant priority established, and money appropriated.
Title
Education partnership program modified, future grant priority established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] |
Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF939 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy