MN HF1063 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; a resolution memorializing the United States government to fund construction costs for proposed veterans homes in Bemidji, Montevideo, and Preston.
Title
Veterans; a resolution memorializing the United States government to fund construction costs for proposed veterans homes in Bemidji, Montevideo, and Preston.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Davids |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Grossell |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Heinrich |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF54 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration