MN HF1081 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forests for the future program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Forests for the future program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1194 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Capital Investment