MN HF1092 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native bee survey funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Native bee survey funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Claflin |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF873 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance