MN HF1127 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kandiyohi County; Trunk Highway 23 segment designated as Ryane Clark Memorial Highway.
Title
Kandiyohi County; Trunk Highway 23 segment designated as Ryane Clark Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1261 |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-26 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1261 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed