MN HF1133 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy systems installation on school buildings by school districts grant program established, account and reserve account created, and money appropriated.
Title
Solar energy systems installation on school buildings by school districts grant program established, account and reserve account created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Edelson |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Huot |
2019-02-19 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Lee, Dehn, and Xiong, J. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1424 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance