MN HF1167 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Breastfeeding disparities study required.
Title
Breastfeeding disparities study required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-28 | House | Authors added Bahner and Mann |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Poppe and Long |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Backer, Acomb, Hansen, Nornes, Her, Hamilton, and Xiong, J. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1383 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Authors added Wiger; Benson