MN HF1179 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Cloud Northstar Commuter Rail extension funding provided, report required, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Cloud Northstar Commuter Rail extension funding provided, report required, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Noor and Dehn |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1892 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Author added Abeler