MN HF119 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Helmets to Hard Hats grant funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Helmets to Hard Hats grant funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Haley |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Albright and Theis |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SF103 (Similar To) 2019-01-14 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy