MN HF1210 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Lucero
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Lucero
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Slow-moving vehicles driving in left lane penalty provided.
Title
Slow-moving vehicles driving in left lane penalty provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added West |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF620 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration