MN HF1226 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-22 - See HF4425
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-22 - See HF4425
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus bonding bill.
Title
Omnibus bonding bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | See HF4425 |
2018-05-20 | House | Authors added Urdahl; Grossell; Jurgens; Bliss; Layman; Barr, R.; Franke and Haley. |
2018-05-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-20 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2018-05-20 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2018-05-20 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate conferees Chamberlain, Dahms, Miller, Senjem, Rest |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate conferees Chamberlain; Dahms; Miller; Senjem; Rest |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | House conferees Davids; McDonald; Hertaus; Drazkowski; Marquart |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill returned to conference committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Taken from table in House |
2018-02-20 | House | House conferees Davids, McDonald, Hertaus, Drazkowski, and Marquart. |
2018-02-20 | House | New conference committee of 5 requested |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to take from table |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate conferees Chamberlain, Dahms, Miller, Senjem, Rest |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-05-18 | House | House conferees Davids, McDonald, Hertaus, Drazkowski, and Marquart. |
2017-05-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Chamberlain; Dahms; Miller; Senjem; Rest |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House conferees Davids; McDonald; Hertaus; Drazkowski; Marquart |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1219 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1219, now on General Orders |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading |
2017-04-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1219 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1226