MN HF1226 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Programs and funding for home visits governed, and money appropriated.
Title
Programs and funding for home visits governed, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-07 | House | Author stricken McDonald |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Poppe and Long |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Bernardy, Backer, Acomb, Hansen, Her, Hamilton, and McDonald |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1438 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy